MA S1897 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-27)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide financial relief to small businesses during the COVID-19 pandemic. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing financial relief to small businesses during the COVID-19 pandemic

Sponsors

Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]
Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Sen. John Cronin [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Sen. Susan Moran [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Rep. Rob Consalvo [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Paul Donato [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. David Muradian [R]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]
Rep. Michael Moran [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Kip Diggs [D]
Sen. Adam Gomez [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Kelly Pease [R]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Peter Durant [R]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2953 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3025 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2929 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3096 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1856 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback