MA S1202 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the unemployment insurance law for workers with fluctuating work schedules. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the unemployment insurance law for workers with fluctuating work schedules

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1983 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1231 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback