MA S1669 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to providing a COVID-19 retirement credit to essential public-sector workers. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to providing a COVID-19 retirement credit to essential public-sector workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02JointHearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2808 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
H2576 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S428 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1773 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2401 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2611 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2553 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S653 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1690 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4218 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Adopted
H4219 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
S1751 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1696 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1707 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1693 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Committee on conference appointed (Rodrigues-Friedman-O'Connor), in concurrence
S1721 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1736 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1749 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2289 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback