MI HB5598 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property: recording; penalties for knowingly drafting or submitting false documents to the register of deeds; provide for. Amends title & sec. 1 of 1883 PA 98 (MCL 565.371).
Title
Property: recording; penalties for knowingly drafting or submitting false documents to the register of deeds; provide for. Amends title & sec. 1 of 1883 PA 98 (MCL 565.371).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2024-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-12 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-03-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2024-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Tullio Liberati |
2024-06-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |