MA S1690 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2679 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1690 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1690.pdf |