MA H4443 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H19
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the alternative superannuation retirement benefit program for teachers
Title
Relative to the alternative superannuation retirement benefit program for teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-26 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-26 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-09 | House | New draft of H19 |
2022-02-09 | House | Pending new draft of H19 |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H19 (Replaces) 2022-02-10 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1790 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H21 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1790 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H21 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4443 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4443.pdf |