MA S1791 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2783
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a retirement enhancement opportunity for certain members of the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System. Public Service.
Title
To provide a retirement enhancement opportunity for certain members of the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2783 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 11, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2620 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S2462 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2022
H3765 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3941 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4093 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2022
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1247 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3254 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1609 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2911
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S1161 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S2783 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2933 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5364 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5420 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Text of an amendment, see S2933
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2559 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2462 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2022
H3765 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3941 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4093 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2022
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1247 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3254 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1609 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2911
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S1161 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S2783 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2933 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5364 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5420 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Text of an amendment, see S2933
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2559 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1791.pdf |