MA H2620 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2783

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-6)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a retirement enhancement opportunity for certain members of the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide a retirement enhancement opportunity for certain members of the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System

Sponsors

Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Susan Moran [D]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Sally Kerans [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Ted Philips [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2783
2022-02-24SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 11, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-08-25JointHearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2559 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2783 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback