MA S2783 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1791
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to establish a retirement enhancement opportunity for certain members of the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2783).
Title
To provide a retirement enhancement opportunity for certain members of the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New draft of S1791 and H2620 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1791 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
H2620 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S2933 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5364 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5420 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Text of an amendment, see S2933
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2559 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2620 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S2933 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5364 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5420 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Text of an amendment, see S2933
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2559 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2783 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2783.pdf |