MA S1247 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2719
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to protections extended to lay teachers in parochial schools. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Regarding protections extended to lay teachers in parochial schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2719 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2719 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1247.pdf |