NY S01001 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from restricting or imposing delays in the distribution of antiretroviral prescription drugs prescribed to a person for the treatment or prevention of the human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) or acquired immunodeficiency syndrome (AIDS).
Title
Prohibits insurers from restricting or imposing delays in the distribution of antiretroviral prescription drugs prescribed to a person for the treatment or prevention of the human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) or acquired immunodeficiency syndrome (AIDS).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.152 |
2024-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a1619a |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1001A |
2024-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-05-23 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2024-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.164 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1325 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01619 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - substituted by s1001a