CO SB048 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recovery from substance use disorders, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Substance Use Disorders Recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-048, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-048, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |