PA HB491 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for energy efficiency and conservation plans with inclusion of mechanical insulation.
Title
Providing for energy efficiency and conservation plans with inclusion of mechanical insulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 491 PN 2790, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Adopt Amendment A03393 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 491 PN 2790, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Adopt Amendment A03393 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2024-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2024-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-08 | House | Second consideration |
2024-03-27 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-26 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES |