AZ HB2911 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1749
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State budget implementation; 2024-2025
Title
State budget implementation; 2024-2025
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2911 substituted for SB 1749. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2911 substituted for SB 1749. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Chapter 223 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2911 substituted for SB 1749. Motion carried. |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-06-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0) |
2024-06-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-06-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-06-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-06-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-06-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0) |
2024-06-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-7-1-0-0-0) |
2024-06-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-06-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-06-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1749 (Replaces) 2024-06-14 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
2024-2025
Appropriating Monies
Budget Stabilization Fund
Budgetary Fund Revisions
Essential Government Services
Retroactivity
State Budget Implementation
Unrestricted Federal Monies
Appropriating Monies
Budget Stabilization Fund
Budgetary Fund Revisions
Essential Government Services
Retroactivity
State Budget Implementation
Unrestricted Federal Monies