NH SB598 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring funeral procession lead vehicles to obey yield signs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring funeral procession lead vehicles to obey yield signs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-26HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16
2024-07-10SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0176; Effective 01/01/2025
2024-06-24SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18
2024-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 41
2024-05-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 05/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 14
2024-05-01HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2024-04-16HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2024-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 7 P. 110
2024-03-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6
2024-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 9
2024-02-06SenateHearing: 02/20/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2024-02-02SenateIntroduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback