MA H2014 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring human service employers to develop and implement programs that prevent workplace violence. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Requiring human service employers to develop and implement programs that prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5233 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H2465 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
H4574 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5233 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S290 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1605 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2465 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
H4574 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5233 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S290 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1605 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2014 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2014.pdf |