MA H2808 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 100-24-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing a COVID-19 retirement credit to essential public-sector workers. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to providing a COVID-19 retirement credit to essential public-sector workers

Sponsors

Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]
Rep. Kip Diggs [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]
Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Paul Frost [R]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Sheila Harrington [R]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D]Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]
Rep. Sally Kerans [D]Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]
Rep. Rob Consalvo [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Turco [D]Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D]Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Sen. Susan Moran [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02JointHearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1669 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback