MA S1387 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a service based retirement option for Group 1 and Group 2 career employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a service based retirement option for Group 1 and Group 2 career employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1451 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1433 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H1463
S1434 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H1460
S1422 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1476 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-17 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H20 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2494 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - See S2481
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-09-24 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback