MA H4967 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to employees of the Western Massachusetts Emergency Communications District. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to allowing employees of the Western Massachusetts Emergency Communications District to become members of the Hampden County retirement system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-07 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
2019-01-01SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-12-31HouseEnacted
2018-12-31SenatePassed to be engrossed
2018-12-31SenateBills in Third Reading report accepted
2018-12-31SenateRead third
2018-12-31SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading
2018-12-28HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-28HouseRules suspended
2018-12-28HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-28HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-2
2018-11-15SenateSenate concurred
2018-11-13HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2018-11-01HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback