MA H2547 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4654

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to direct the Teachers’ Retirement System to grant certain creditable service for retirement purposes to Thomas Richard Kinsky. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Massachusetts Teachers' Retirement System to grant creditable service to Thomas Richard Kinsky

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4654
2017-06-22JointHearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1
2017-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2539 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H18 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback