MA H2546 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4654

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to creditable service within the Teachers’ Retirement System for service rendered in territories or military bases. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Massachusetts teacher retirement system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4654
2017-10-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1428 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S308 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4391
S1046 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1364 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H647 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1404 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1415 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2209 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - New draft substituted, see S2592
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2592 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback