MA S1451 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the hours of employment of pensioners for services after retirement in the public sector. Public Service.
Title
Relative to increasing the hours of employment of pensioners for services after retirement in the public sector
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Harold Naughton [D] |
Sen. John Velis [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1041 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2110
S1043 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1420 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2017
S1478 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2068 (Similar To) 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2017
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4168 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2689 (Similar To) 2018-12-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/26/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1043 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1420 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2017
S1478 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2068 (Similar To) 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2017
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4168 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2689 (Similar To) 2018-12-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/26/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1451 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1451.pdf |