MA H3724 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the other post-employment benefits trust fund of the town of Wellesley. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the other post employment benefits trust fund of the town of Wellesley
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-02 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006 |
2017-11-02 | House | Read third |
2017-08-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-08-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4006 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3724 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3724.pdf |