MA H1698 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4481

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the disclosure of relations to state employees by candidates for employment. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the sunshine policy disclosure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4481
2017-10-30JointHearing scheduled for 11/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H3802 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
H1348 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
H1367 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1
H1325 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1
S1734 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1384 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H31 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback