MA S1427 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2491

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize a local option for group retirement classification. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to authorizing a local option for group retirement classification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2491
2017-10-24JointHearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1431 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1375 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback