MA S1431 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to ordinary disability retirements. Public Service.
Title
Relative to ordinary disability retirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S572 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1921 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1639 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3063 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1768 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1535 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3857
H1470 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H499 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H495 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1921 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1639 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3063 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1768 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1535 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3857
H1470 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H499 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H495 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1431.pdf |