MA H56 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the percentum change in the average cost-of-living as shown by the United States consumer price index for the year 2016 compared with such index for the year 2015. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An annual report of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (under sections 21, 102 and 103 of Chapter 32 of the General Laws) relative to the percentum change in the average cost-of-living as shown by the United States consumer price index for the year 2016 compared with such index for the year 2015.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01HouseNo further action taken
2017-04-06JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-17SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-12HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1375 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S772 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1032 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H1322 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback