MA H1452 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4654

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requests for funding for certain public employee collective bargaining agreements. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide funding of certain collective bargaining agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4654
2017-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1438 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback