MA H2545 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4654

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to increasing the amount of earnings that a retired public employee may be paid for certain additional public service. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to capping payment of pensioners for services after retirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4654
2017-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1451 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1375 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1032 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S772 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback