MA H5028 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H5011

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to certain retirement benefits for Harold F. MacGilvray, Jr

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain retirement benefits for Harold F. MacGilvray, Jr

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2018
2019-01-01SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-01-01HouseEnacted
2019-01-01SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-01-01HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-01-01SenatePassed to be engrossed
2019-01-01SenateBills in the Third Reading report accepted
2019-01-01SenateRead third
2019-01-01SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading
2018-12-31HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-31HouseRules suspended
2018-12-31HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-12-31HouseNew draft of H5011
2018-12-31HousePending new draft of H5011
2018-12-31HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H5011 (Replaces) 2018-12-31 - New draft substituted, see 5028
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback