MA H5011 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5028

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - New draft substituted, see 5028
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the retirement benefits of Harold F. MacGilvray, Jr., a former police officer of Metropolitan District Commission police. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing a corrective change to Chapter 154 of the Acts of 1983

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseNew draft substituted, see 5028
2018-12-31HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2018-12-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending
2018-12-31HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2018-12-31HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5028
2018-12-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-12-24JointHearing scheduled for 12/26/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2018-12-20SenateSenate concurred
2018-12-17HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2018-12-13HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H1368 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1412 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2531 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1381 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1455 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H5028 (Replaced by) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback