MA H171 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Ultrino of Malden, a petition of Steven Ultrino and others for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) of anti-poverty strategies aimed at reducing chronic, multi-generational family poverty. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission on two-generation approaches to childhood education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H380 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H13 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H137 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H130 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H876 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2741 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H729 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S238 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1861 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H190 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback