MA H13 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Massachusetts Gaming Commission (House, No. 12) as relates to horse racing and wagering. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to horse racing and wagering
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-13 | House | Adopted, in concurrence |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
H389 (Similar To) 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H389 (Similar To) 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H13 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H13.pdf |