MA S2321 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Communication from the Massachusetts Gaming Commission (pursuant to Section 9B of Chapter 128A of the General Laws) submitting proposed amendments to regulations for 205 CMR 6.35: Pick (n) Pools
Title
Communication from the Massachusetts Gaming Commission (pursuant to Section 9B of Chapter 128A of the General Laws) submitting proposed amendments to regulations for 205 CMR 6.35: Pick (n) Pools
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed on file |
2019-08-19 | House | House concurred |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2321 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2321.pdf |