MA H4070 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5032
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of licenses by the Massachusetts Gaming Commission in Bristol, Plymouth, Nantucket, Dukes and Barnstable counties. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the authority of the Massachusetts Gaming Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5032 |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday February 28, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-09-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
S2219 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H3677
H3996 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
S1482 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5032 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2219 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H3677
H3996 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
S1482 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5032 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4070 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4070.pdf |