MA H876 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H877
Note: Replaces legislation H878

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the status of wild striped bass in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the conservation of striped bass

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-15HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-08-19HouseBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2019-08-19HouseAccompanied by H877 and H878
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S1187 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H775 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3642 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2019
H877 (Replaces) 2019-08-19 - Accompanied H876
H878 (Replaces) 2019-08-19 - Accompanied H876
H4167 (Similar To) 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback