MA H4167 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to alternate members of the conservation commission in the town of Clinton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for alternate members of the conservation commission of the town of Clinton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-04 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1187 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H775 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H3642 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2019
H4164 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4336
H4165 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4337
H775 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H3642 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2019
H4164 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4336
H4165 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4337
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4167 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4167.pdf |