MA S2221 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Cannabis Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a commission to study the effects of K2 in state prisons. Cannabis Policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the effects of K2 in state prisons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-12JointHearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2019-05-13HouseHouse concurred
2019-05-02SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended
2019-04-25SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S670 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - House concurred
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4070 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H190 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
H2187 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2189 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2446 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback