MA S2437 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Aurora Wilber, an employee of the Massachusetts Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Aurora Wilber, an employee of the Massachusetts Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-01-16HouseRules suspended
2020-01-16HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-01-13HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering Policy and Scheduling
2020-01-09SenateRead third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
2020-01-09SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-12-23SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-12-23SenateRules suspended
2019-12-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2019-12-11HouseHouse concurred
2019-12-09SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2019-12-09SenateRules suspended
2019-11-27SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4250 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback