MA H4237 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4215). November 27, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Shannon Ondras, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2019-11-27HousePassed to be engrossed
2019-11-27HouseSubstituted for H4215

Same As/Similar To

H3693 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
H3744 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2019
H3970 (Similar To) 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019
H3975 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4251 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback