MA H3693 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Scott A. Smith, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Scott A. Smith, an employee of the Trial Court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
2019-07-18SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-07-18HouseEnacted
2019-07-18SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-07-18HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-07-16SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-07-16SenateTaken from the Orders of the Day
2019-05-20SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2019-05-16HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-04-29HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-04-29HouseRules suspended
2019-04-29HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-04-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-04-18HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3744 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2019
H3970 (Similar To) 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019
H3975 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2019
H4215 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4251 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback