MA H2741 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish the Massachusetts law revision commission. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Massachusetts law revision commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2019-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback