MA H729 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the long-term management and maintenance of certain harbor islands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve to establish a special commission to perform an investigation and providing for a study relative to the long term management, maintenance and future use of the Boston Harbor Long and Moon Islands

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2019-06-13HouseResolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H1195 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H529 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H474 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H560 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2052 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback