MA H726 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public access to Long Island in Boston Harbor. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to public access to Long Island in Boston Harbor
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2748 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2748 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H726 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H726.pdf |