MA H474 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to child suicide. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to child suicide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback