MA H137 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission to review existing mandated reporter laws and regulations and to improve the response to, and prevention of, child abuse and neglect. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mandated reporter reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-03-12JointHearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H729 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H171 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H380 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H13 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H130 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H876 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
H2741 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2026 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S238 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S1861 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H190 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1455 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3303 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1223 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2221 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - House concurred
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback