MA S428 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2544

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote voter engagement. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to promoting voter engagement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2544
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H1302 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S383 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S414 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S395 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S400 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H680 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H719 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
S2290 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback