MA S414 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to use of ranked choice voting in elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To use of ranked choice voting in elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H1302 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S428 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S383 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S395 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S400 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H680 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H719 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H3208 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
S2290 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H635 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H643 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H673 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H674 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback