MA H4034 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to recall elections in the town of Charlton. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to recall elections in the town of Charlton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-05SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2020-02-03HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-01-09HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-01-09HouseRules suspended
2020-01-09HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-12-19HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-08-08SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-05HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
S1187 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S1672 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H3634 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H4065 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback