MA S2275 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for recall elections in the town of Westport. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for recall elections in the town of Westport

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
2019-10-07SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-10-07HouseEnacted
2019-10-03SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2019-10-03SenateRules suspended
2019-09-26HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2019-09-05HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-09-05HouseRules suspended
2019-09-05HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-09-03HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-08-29SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2019-08-29SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-07-29SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-06-27HouseHouse concurred
2019-06-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1302 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S414 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2290 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S400 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H680 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback